Detlef Schößler
- Date of birth/Age: Oct 3, 1962 (61)
- Place of birth: Magdeburg
- Citizenship: Germany
- Coaching Licence : A Licence
- Avg. term as coach : 0.88 Years
Former player:
Last club :
SV 1919 Grimma
Retired :
Jul 1, 2001
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | from / until | Days in charge | Matches | W | D | L | Players used | ø-Goals | PPM | Games / PPG | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IMO Merseburg Manager | 17/18 (Jul 1, 2017) | 17/18 (Jun 30, 2018) | 17/18 (Jul 1, 2017) / 17/18 (Jun 30, 2018) | 364 Days | 28 | 14 | 8 | 6 | 25 | 2.46 : 1.39 | 1.79 | 28 / 1.79 | ||
RB Leipzig U19 Manager | 11/12 (Jul 1, 2011) | 11/12 (Sep 22, 2011) | 11/12 (Jul 1, 2011) / 11/12 (Sep 22, 2011) | 83 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
E. Cottbus U19 Manager | 08/09 (Jul 1, 2008) | 09/10 (Jun 30, 2010) | 08/09 (Jul 1, 2008) / 09/10 (Jun 30, 2010) | 729 Days | 56 | 27 | 11 | 18 | 55 | 1.59 : 1.25 | 1.64 | 56 / 1.64 | ||
Halle II Manager | 07/08 (Jul 1, 2007) | 07/08 (Jun 30, 2008) | 07/08 (Jul 1, 2007) / 07/08 (Jun 30, 2008) | 365 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
Hallescher FC Manager | 06/07 (Nov 7, 2006) | 06/07 (Jun 30, 2007) | 06/07 (Nov 7, 2006) / 06/07 (Jun 30, 2007) | 235 Days | 19 | 6 | 6 | 7 | 28 | 1.00 : 1.05 | 1.26 | 19 / 1.26 | ||
Halle U19 Manager | 06/07 (Jul 1, 2006) | 06/07 (Nov 6, 2006) | 06/07 (Jul 1, 2006) / 06/07 (Nov 6, 2006) | 128 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - | ||
S. Leipzig U19 Manager | 04/05 (Jul 1, 2004) | 05/06 (Jun 30, 2006) | 04/05 (Jul 1, 2004) / 05/06 (Jun 30, 2006) | 729 Days | 26 | 11 | 4 | 11 | 27 | 1.50 : 1.54 | 1.42 | 26 / 1.42 | ||
SV 1919 Grimma Manager | 03/04 (Oct 17, 2003) | 03/04 (Feb 23, 2004) | 03/04 (Oct 17, 2003) / 03/04 (Feb 23, 2004) | 129 Days | 11 | 2 | 2 | 7 | 25 | 0.82 : 1.64 | 0.73 | 11 / 0.73 | ||
VfB Leipzig Manager | 02/03 (Mar 26, 2003) | 02/03 (Jun 30, 2003) | 02/03 (Mar 26, 2003) / 02/03 (Jun 30, 2003) | 96 Days | 10 | 5 | 1 | 4 | 28 | 1.20 : 1.00 | 1.60 | 10 / 1.60 | ||
VfB Leipzig U19 Manager | 01/02 (Jul 1, 2001) | 01/02 (Jun 30, 2002) | 01/02 (Jul 1, 2001) / 01/02 (Jun 30, 2002) | 364 Days | - | - | - | - | - | 0.00 : 0.00 | 0.00 | - |
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
Season | Date | Left | Joined | MV | Fee | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/02 | Jul 1, 2001 | SV 1919 Grimma | Retired | - | - | |||||
98/99 | Jul 1, 1998 | VfB Leipzig | SV 1919 Grimma | - | free transfer | |||||
95/96 | Jul 1, 1995 | Dynamo Dresden | VfB Leipzig | - | ? | |||||
89/90 | Jul 1, 1989 | 1.FC Magdeburg | Dynamo Dresden | - | ? | |||||
80/81 | Mar 7, 1981 | Magdeburg U19 | 1.FC Magdeburg | - | - | |||||
Total transfer fees: | 0 |